CA AB37 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 19905) to Chapter 11 of Part 11 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to libraries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Libraries: 3D printers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code19905New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6254.31New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code14350New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback