CA AB37 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 995 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment insurance: reporting requirements: status of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 37 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-25SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella.
2014-08-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-04SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2013-08-12SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-08-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-06-27SenateRe-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and APPR.
2013-06-24SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1659.)
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-01-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2012-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2012-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21167.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code995Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10544.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_37&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20130318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20130620_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20130812_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20130415_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20130528_0102PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20140625_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback