CA AB37 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66020 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: honorary degrees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-20 - Assembly - AB 37 FURUTANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB37 Furutani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 37 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-08-31 Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
2009-08-20 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2656.)
2009-08-17 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-17 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1843.)
2009-07-15 Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-07-14 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-07-08 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-06-29 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-06-10 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2009-05-14 Referred to Com. on ED.
2009-05-04 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-04 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1234.)
2009-04-30 From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
2009-04-27 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-04-23 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
2009-04-16 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-26 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-03-25 Read second time and amended.
2009-03-24 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17).
2009-03-11 Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2009-03-10 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. (Corrected March 12.)
2009-03-03 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-02-05 Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2008-12-02 From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2008-12-01 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66020New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_37&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20090310_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20090325_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20090415_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20090708_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20090825_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090317_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090422_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090504_1252PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090817_1250PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_37_vote_20090820_1019AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback