CA AB369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 904.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to appeals.
Title
Appeals: child custody orders or judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Assembly - AB 369 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB369 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 369 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB369 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 369 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2343.). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 647.) |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 904.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |