CA AB367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1522, 1568.09, 1569.17, and 1596.871 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.
Title
Presence at care facilities: conviction of crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.871 | Amended Code | Citation Text |