CA AB366 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.75 (commencing with Section 7292.5) of Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Transactions and use taxes: City of Alameda.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 366 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB366 Bonta By Hancock (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 366 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB366 Bonta By Hancock (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 366 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 30. Page 6419.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) . |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4958.). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1801.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7292.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.194 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.196 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14301.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |