CA AB364 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 9998 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to foreign labor contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign labor contractor registration: agricultural workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 364 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1694.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2021-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code9998Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback