CA AB364 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 186.11 of the Penal Code, relating to restitution.
Title
Restitution: asset seizures: fraud and embezzlement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent #6 AB364 Bonilla By Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AB 364 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AB 364 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-07-11 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-11 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1786.). | |
2011-07-06 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 186.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |