CA AB36 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1954.52 of the Civil Code, relating to residential rental housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential tenancies: rent control.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1954.52Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback