CA AB36 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827.10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Eligible fuel cell electrical generating facilities: energy metering.
Sponsors
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB36 Nazarian By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 36 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 36 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2990.). |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2989.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2944.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |