CA AB36 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.6 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 270 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to probation.
Title
Probation officer: appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |