CA AB36 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to public education.
Title
Public education: basic skills training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |