CA AB355 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-06 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-06 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to property tax agents.
Title
Property tax agents.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 355 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 355 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1842.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |