CA AB353 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3550 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parole: medical parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_353&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_353_bill_20130213_introduced.html |