CA AB352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 47 (commencing with Section 80200) to the Public Resources Code, relating to a wildfire prevention, safe drinking water, drought preparation, and flood protection program, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.
Title
Wildfire Prevention, Safe Drinking Water, Drought Preparation, and Flood Protection Bond Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 352 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 2155.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 80200 | New Code | See Bill Text |