CA AB351 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14838.8 to the Government Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: small business participation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-05-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2015-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
2015-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2015-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14838.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback