CA AB351 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14087.98 of the Welfare and InstitutionsCode, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: county organized health system.
Sponsors
Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Doug La Malfa [R] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 351 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 351 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1454.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2011-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25503.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |