CA AB35 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 105185 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 147.3 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Worker safety: blood lead levels: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 35 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB35 Kalra et al. By Leyva (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 35 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 3274.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2688.).
2019-09-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 2016.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 20).
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code105185Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code147.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback