CA AB347 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1367.241 and 1367.244 of, and to add Section 1367.206 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10123.191, 10123.197, and 10123.201 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: step therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 347 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB347 Arambula et al. By Wiener (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 347 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 6).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2021-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback