CA AB346 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45125.01 and 49024 of the Education Code, relating to schools, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Schools: noncertificated candidates: Activity Supervisor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Assembly - AB 346 CONWAY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB346 Conway Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 346 TORLAKSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB346 Conway Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 346 TORLAKSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-07-01 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:05 p.m. | |
2010-07-01 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) | |
2010-06-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-06-28 | Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 4088.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4088.) | |
2010-06-24 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-21 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2010-06-14 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1950.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 28). | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45125.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |