CA AB344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 40255 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Toll evasion violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 344 MELENDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 962.) |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |