CA AB342 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 70615 of the Government Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 10878 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 9800 of, and to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 22425) of Chapter 7 of Division 11 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: automated speed enforcement: five-year pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 70615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9800 | New Code | See Bill Text |