CA AB336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7125.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: workers’ compensation insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB336 Cervantes et al (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 336 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 336 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2432.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1751.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7125.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |