CA AB3336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 113982 of, and to add Section 113930.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Third-party food delivery platforms: food safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3336 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3336 Carrillo By Monning (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 3336 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 9.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6.).
2020-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 10).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 18.)
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 2).
2020-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code113930.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code113982Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback