CA AB332 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 121690 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to rabies.
Title
Rabies control data.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - AB 332 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - AB 332 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1522.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 121690 | Amended Code | Citation Text |