CA AB332 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, renumber, and repeal Section 25150.8 of, and to add and repeal Article 11.2 (commencing with Section 25230) of Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste: treated wood waste: management standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Assembly - AB 332 E.S. & T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By QUIRK (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB332 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 332 E.S. & T.M. Third Reading Urgency By QUIRK (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2021.
2021-08-31 Approved by the Governor.
2021-08-30 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-23SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-23SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-23SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
2021-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2021-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2021-01-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
2021-01-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25150.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback