CA AB332 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 10234.75 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 332 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB332 Calderon By Liu (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 332 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB332 Calderon By Liu (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 332 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 2838.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2334.). |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 1384.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10234.75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |