CA AB332 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6720 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Occupational safety and health: adult films.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. & E. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6720 | New Code | See Bill Text |