CA AB330 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 68651 and 70626 of the Government Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appointed legal counsel in civil cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB330 Gabriel et al. By Glazer (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 330 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2137.).
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 1776.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1565.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2019-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code68651Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code70626Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback