CA AB3242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 149, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1799.111 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 5151 of, and to add Section 5150.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health: involuntary commitment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3242 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3242 Irwin By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3242 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 149, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5429.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-08-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-08-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4730.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2020-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1799.111Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5150.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5151Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback