CA AB323 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41781.3, 42649.1, and 42649.2 of, and to add Section 41781.4 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: recycling: diversion: green materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 41781.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41781.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42649.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42649.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |