CA AB321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8210, 8211, and 8241.5 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 10271 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare services: enrollment priority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 321 Valladares Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB321 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 321 Valladares Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB321 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 321 Valladares Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 903, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5366.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3399.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on E.D.) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3186.) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8241.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |