CA AB32 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12209, 17053.57, and 23657 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Insurance taxes: income taxes: credits: community development financial institution investments.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 32 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB32 John A. P (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 32 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB32 John A. P (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 32 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3069.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2232.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1658.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |