CA AB319 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 85320 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: contributions: foreign governments or principals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB319 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 319 Valladares Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 319 Valladares Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2236.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |