CA AB319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 42380) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: single-use plastic beverage container caps.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 8). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42380 | New Code | See Bill Text |