CA AB3182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4740 of, and to add Section 4741 to, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 65852.2 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing:governing documents: rental or leasing of separate interests: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3182 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3182 Ting By Gonzalez (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3182 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3182 Ting By Gonzalez (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3182 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 5453.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9.). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 6). |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 4817.) |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4741 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |