CA AB317 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 46393 to the Education Code, relating to school attendance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
School attendance: H1N1 (2009) influenza virus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 317 SOLORIO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 317 SOLORIO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-07-15 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-24 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3886.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). | |
2010-01-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-15 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 13). | |
2010-01-07 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |
2010-01-04 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2009-10-30 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-10-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46393 | New Code | See Bill Text |