CA AB3152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 214 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: welfare exemption: rental housing: moderate income housing.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |