CA AB3142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 78085) to Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 61 of Chapter 54 of the Statutes of 2022, relating to public postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Los Angeles Community College District: California Center for Climate Change Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78085 | New Code | See Bill Text |