CA AB3141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 107.15 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: possessory interests: seaport environmental improvements.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 107.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |