CA AB3133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13286 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to refugees.
Title
Refugees: resettlement.
Sponsors
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3133 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Durazo (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3133 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3133 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4290.). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 30). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4682.) |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13286 | New Code | See Bill Text |