CA AB3131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 12.8 (commencing with Section 7070) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to military equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement agencies: military equipment: funding, acquisition, and use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3131 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - tr> (Y: 5 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3131 Gloria et al. By Hill (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3131 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 3131 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading Amend By GLORIA Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 36. Page 7018.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 5981.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and GOV. & F.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 5632.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5382.)
2018-05-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5365.)
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 23).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7070New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback