CA AB313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 11375) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1825 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1055, 1552, and 1845 of, to add Section 1837 to, and to repeal and add Article 2 (commencing with Section 1831) of Chapter 12 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB313 Gray By Cannella (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 313 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 313 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-16AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 3547.).
2017-09-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3547.)
2017-09-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 3020.).
2017-09-15SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-15Senate(Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3013.)
2017-09-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 1812.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11375New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code1055New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code1525New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code1552New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code174New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code175New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code1825Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1845New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code275New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback