CA AB3109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 949, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1670.11 to the Civil Code, relating to contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts: waiver of right of petition or free speech.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 3109 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3109 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3109 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 949, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6363.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5206.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1670.11New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback