CA AB310 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4148 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to the State Department of State Hospitals.
Title
State Department of State Hospitals: civil service psychiatrists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 310 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB310 Arambula By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 310 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB310 Arambula By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 310 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2.). |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5228.). |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 1966.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4148 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |