CA AB310 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12651 and 12652 of the Government Code, and to add Part 27 (commencing with Section 50301) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wealth tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-03-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-01-26AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
2021-01-25AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12651Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12652Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code50301New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback