CA AB3094 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1156.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural labor relations: labor representative elections: misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1156.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback