CA AB3087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 23 (commencing with Section 100600) to the Government Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Health Care Cost, Quality, and Equity Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24).
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100600New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code128741New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1340Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback