CA AB308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 851 and 1000 of, and to add Sections 851.1 and 17201.1 to, the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts.
Title
Procedures for litigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB308 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 308 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 308 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1487.). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 647.) |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 1000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 17201.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 851.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |