CA AB308 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 806 to the Evidence Code, and to add Section 686.3 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal investigations.
Title
Criminal investigations: eyewitness identification:
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 308 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 308 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 1791.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 806 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 686.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |